HI SB72 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB72
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
For applications filed on or after July 1, 2023, requires the Public Utilities Commission to render decisions on certain renewable projects, power purchase agreements, and cost recovery applications within one hundred eighty days of the filing of the application and establishes procedures and requirements for the applications. Exempts certain power purchase agreement amendments from the Public Utilities Commission review and approval process in certain circumstances. Requires a public utility requesting an amendment to a power purchase agreement to submit an informational filing to the Public Utilities Commission. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Renewable Energy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN , referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 74) in amended form (SD 2). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, San Buenaventura. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, Elefante). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 754) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2023-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fukunaga ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-21-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 19) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to EET, CPN. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB72 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN , referral sheet 17