HI SB708 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB708
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Technology and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Technology and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for capital improvement projects of the department of accounting and general services.
Title
Relating To The Department Of Accounting And General Services.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] |
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to TEC, WAM. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO/TEC, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB708 (Carry Over) 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to TEC, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=708&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB708_.HTM |