HI SB699 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-24 - Re-Referred to TIA/AGL, CPN.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes food, water, cargo hold temperature, cargo transfer, and certification requirements for air transport of live animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aircraft; Transfer of Animals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-24SenateRe-Referred to TIA/AGL, CPN.
2013-01-22SenateReferred to AGL, CPN.
2013-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1145 (Same As) 2013-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback