HI SB694 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB694
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a purchaser or transferee to execute a sea level rise hazard exposure statement with every sale or transfer of real estate that acknowledges that the purchaser or transferee has looked at the appropriate sea level rise hazard exposure map and accepts risks of purchasing or accepting a transfer of property that is at risk of climate-related exposure. Takes effect 11/01/2019. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Real Property Transactions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2296) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Inouye. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-18 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to WTL, CPH. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB694 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to WTL, CPH.