HI SB693 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB693

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of land natural resources and department of agriculture to meet and identify the non-agricultural park lands that should be rezoned as those in the conservation district. Requires that agricultural lands under the jurisdiction of the department of land and natural resources be transferred to the department of agriculture not later than 12/31/2023. Requires the department of land and natural resources and department of agriculture to meet every five years to discuss transferring remaining lands. Requires the department of agriculture to inquire about any easements needed by the department of land and natural resources before offering a lease. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Transfer Of Non-agricultural Park Lands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-19SenateReported from WTL/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 486) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on WTL/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-21 1:15PM in conference room 229 & Videoconference.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to WTL/AEN, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB469 (Same As)
SB693 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback