HI SB688 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB688
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to EDU, JDC.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to EDU, JDC.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits persons from interfering with or disrupting the orderly operation, safety, or peaceful conduct of a school or school-related activity. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 316) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 02-13-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB944 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB688 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
SB688 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.