HI SB676 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB676

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the minimum wage for certain employees to $12.00 per hour beginning 7/1/2022. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Minimum Wage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 251) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-03-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella, Gabbard, Ihara, Kim, Misalucha . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Riviere, Wakai). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05SenateDeferred One Day 03-09-21.
2021-03-04SenateOne Day Notice 03-05-21.
2021-03-04SenateReported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 742) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Gabbard, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Kim.
2021-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-22-21 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-16SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC.
2021-02-16SenateReported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 260) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC.
2021-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, Chang, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 3:00PM in conference room 225.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to LCA, WAM/JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB676 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 22

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback