HI SB672 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB672
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides appropriations for collective bargaining cost items for the members of bargaining unit (10) and their excluded counterparts, including the cost of salary adjustments negotiated between the State and the bargaining unit representative for fiscal biennium 2021-2023.
Title
Relating To Public Employment Cost Items.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB672 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to LCA, WAM.
HB326 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
HB326 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=672&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB672_.HTM |