HI SB658 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB658
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires motor vehicles to have headlights and taillights on at all times during the operation of the vehicle.
Title
Relating To Transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM, CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB658 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=658&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB658_.HTM |