HI SB654 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows election-day voter registration.
Title
Voter Registration; Election Day Registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26 | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 60). | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Hemmings). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) One Day Notice 03-06-09. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 476) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JGO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Bunda, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-09 9:00 AM in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |