HI SB650 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits doctors, nurses, and physician's assistants from prescribing long-acting opioid painkillers in emergency rooms. Prohibits doctors, nurses, and physician's assistants in emergency rooms from prescribing more than a seven-day supply of opioid painkillers other than long-acting opioid painkillers. Prohibits doctors, nurses, and physician's assistants in emergency rooms from refilling prescriptions for opioid painkillers that have been lost, stolen, or destroyed. Establishes exceptions. Effective July 1, 2050. (SD1)
Title
Prescriptions; Hospitals; Emergency Rooms
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 451) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-13 1:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HTH/CPN, JDL. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |