HI SB64 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB64
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the insurance commissioner to establish an annual enrollment period for medigap insurance plans. Requires issuers of Medigap insurance in the State to accept an eligible individual's application for coverage during the open enrollment period. Prohibits issuers from denying the applicant a Medigap policy or certificate or making any premium rate distinctions due to various reasons, including health status. Requires the insurance commissioner to amend or adopt rules accordingly. Effective 12/31/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Medicare Supplement Insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1). |
2023-03-17 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1288) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-03-15 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi. |
2023-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-15-23 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 72) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 838) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 03-02-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 229. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 9:35AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 304) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to HHS, CPN. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB64 (Carry Over) 2023-03-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
HB539 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB539 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Subjects
Guaranteed-Issue Open Enrollment Period
Insurance Commissioner
Medicare Supplement Insurance
Medigap Insurance
Rules
Insurance Commissioner
Medicare Supplement Insurance
Medigap Insurance
Rules