HI SB636 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB636
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes from the definition of "advertisement" communications on clothing and other attire associated with a candidate's candidate committee. Removes clothing, other attire, yard signs, and sundry items and advertisements made by a candidate or candidate's candidate committee from electioneering communication reporting requirements.
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB636 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JDC.
HB656 (Same As) 2021-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and none excused (0).
HB656 (Same As) 2021-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and none excused (0).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=636&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB636_.HTM |