HI SB632 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB632
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the launching, landing, or recovering of an unmanned aerial system at a public park or beach without the prior consent of DOT. Prohibits the operation of an unmanned aerial system over any public park or beach at an altitude that interferes with the use of the land or water, or the space above the land or water, or is dangerous to others. Defines "unmanned "aerial system".
Title
Relating To Unmanned Aerial Systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee on TRE deferred the measure. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE deferred the measure until 02-08-17 1:41PM in conference room 225. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-17 2:00PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRE/WTL, CPH. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB632 (Carry Over) 2017-02-08 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=632&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB632_.HTM |