HI SB632 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-08 - Act 218, 7/7/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1328).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes environmental courts as divisions of the circuit courts and district courts to hear proceedings, including certain chapter 91, Hawaii Revised Statutes, proceedings arising from certain environmental laws. Requires the Judiciary to convene a working group and report to the Legislature the total number of environmental-related cases filed in the last five years and recommendations for implementing environmental courts in the State. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental Court; Judicial Review

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-08SenateAct 218, 7/7/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1328).
2014-07-08HouseAct 218, on 7/7/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1328).
2014-05-01SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2014-05-01SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751).
2014-04-30HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720).
2014-04-29HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano, Har, McDermott, Tokioka voting no (5) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
2014-04-29SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Slom. 0 Excused: none.
2014-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-29-14.
2014-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 101-14) as amended in (CD 1).
2014-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14.
2014-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 101-14).
2014-04-25HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Ing, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Rhoads.
2014-04-25SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Hee, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2014-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 at 3:35 pm in conference room 225.
2014-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 1:35PM in conference room 225.
2014-04-23SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 10:30AM in conference room 225.
2014-04-22SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 10:59AM in conference room 225.
2014-04-21SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-14 3:45PM in conference room 225.
2014-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685).
2014-04-14HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 676).
2014-04-14SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Hee Co-Chair; Ihara Member.
2014-04-14HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Rhoads, Lowen Co-Chairs; Ing, Thielen Members.
2014-04-10HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670).
2014-04-10SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2014-04-10SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 513).
2014-04-08HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Oshiro, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano, Har, McDermott voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2014-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1643-14), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2014-03-31HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Woodson, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tokioka, Yamashita; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
2014-03-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-31-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2014-03-21HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Awana, Fale, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro voting no (2) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
2014-03-21HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1170-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2014-03-18HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, C. Lee, Nakashima, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Ito, Tsuji; 1 Noes: Representative(s) McDermott; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Wooley.
2014-03-14HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-18-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2014-03-14HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano, Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Tokioka, Yamashita excused (4).
2014-03-14HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 974-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2014-03-11HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Thielen, Cullen, Evans, Say, Nishimoto, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fale; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Kawakami.
2014-03-07HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-11-14 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
2014-03-06HouseReferred to EEP, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 28
2014-03-06HousePass First Reading
2014-03-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 75) in amended form (SD 2).
2014-03-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2014-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
2014-02-28SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2586) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2014-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Solomon, Slom.
2014-02-14SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-14 10:30AM in conference room 016.
2014-02-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
2014-02-13SenateReported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2339) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
2014-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom.
2014-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-14 2:50PM in conference room 225.
2013-12-18 Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
2013-01-31SenateThe committee on ENE deferred the measure.
2013-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 2:45PM in conference room 225.
2013-01-22SenateReferred to ENE, JDL.
2013-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback