HI SB622 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB622
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that all lease extensions for public lands be subject to public auction.
Title
Relating To Public Lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB622 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=622&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB622_.HTM |