HI SB622 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - The committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-07-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Alters the definition of "business" or "engaging" in business under the general excise tax laws to exclude casual sales and businesses that have a worldwide web site as a third-party content provider on a computer physically located in the State but owned by a non-affiliated person; use non-affiliated third-party call centers that accept and process telephone or electronic orders of tangible personal property or licenses primarily from non-Hawaii buyers, which orders are forwarded to a location outside of Hawaii for filing, or to provide services primarily to non-Hawaii customers; and activities of a person without physical presence in the State if the person and the person's affiliates have less than $100,000 of gross receipts in the State based on receipts from the prior calendar year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-07-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2017-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2017-01-23SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2017-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback