HI SB607 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB607

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Removes the construction completion deadline for the Leialii affordable housing project. Allows HHFDC to address historic preservation laws when funding is appropriated for each portion of the Leialii affordable housing project. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Affordable Housing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-25HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-03-25HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1454), recommending referral to FIN.
2021-03-23HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
2021-03-19HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
2021-03-19HouseReported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1100) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-03-18HouseThe committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi.
2021-03-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 03-18-21 9:15AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-12HouseReferred to HSG, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 23
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-11HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 429) in amended form (SD 3).
2021-03-11SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-09Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-11-21.
2021-03-09SenateReport filed.
2021-03-09SenateSeparated Committee Report.
2021-03-09SenateFloor amendment adopted as amended (SD 3).
2021-03-09SenateFloor Amendment No. 2 offered.
2021-03-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-04SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 722) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-18SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-12SenateReported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 210) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-01-29SenateThe committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-21 1:00PM in conference room 225.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to HOU, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1311 (Same As)
SB607 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback