HI SB605 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restructures the Department of Education into two major divisions the academic achievement division and the administration division and establishes two senior deputy superintendent positions to head the divisions. Changes the salary cap for certain superintendent positions to ninety per cent, rather than eighty per cent of the superintendent's salary. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB605 HD1)
Title
DOE; Restructuring
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1106) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Takumi, Belatti, Aquino, Awana, Mizuno, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Saiki, Takai, Wooley, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Chang, Hanohano. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-21-11 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 141) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara, Taniguchi . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Slom, Solomon). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 657) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-11 9:20AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-17 | (S) Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 298) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to EDU, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |