HI SB604 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB604
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Insurance Commissioner to set the maximum wholesale prices of common prescription drugs based upon Canadian price regulations. Prohibits drug makers and distributors from removing prescription drugs from Hawaii markets. Prohibits various health plans and pharmacies from purchasing prescription drugs in excess of the maximum wholesale price.
Title
Related To Prescription Drug Costs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB18 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB604 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HTH, CPN.
SB604 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HTH, CPN.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=604&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB604_.HTM |