HI SB604 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to WLA/CPH/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to WLA/CPH/JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Grown Origin Products Commission to identify and regulate the labeling of selected products grown or produced in Hawaii. Establishes the Hawaii Grown Origin Products Special Fund. Makes appropriations.
Title
Agriculture; Regulation; Labeling; Hawaii Grown Origin Products Commission; Established ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to WLA/CPH/JDL, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee on AGL deferred the measure. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-15 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to AGL/CPN, JDL/WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1056 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=604&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB604_.HTM |