HI SB602 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB602
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits certain contracts for managed care entered into after June 30, 2021, from containing a provision that authorizes a pharmacy benefit manager to reimburse a contracting pharmacy on a maximum allowable cost basis, and voids any such provisions in existing managed care contracts. Prohibits pharmacy benefit managers from engaging in unfair methods of competition or unfair practices. Prohibits a pharmacy benefit manager from reimbursing a 340B pharmacy differently than any other network pharmacy. Prohibits a pharmacy benefit manager from reimbursing an independent or rural pharmacy an amount less than the rural rate for each drug under certain circumstances. Prohibits a pharmacy benefit manager from restricting a pharmacist's ability to provide certain information to insureds. Increases pharmacy benefit managers' annual reporting requirements. Requires the insurance commissioner to file annual reports with the legislature. Increases pharmacy benefit manager registration and renewal fees by an unspecified amount. Makes certain violations of pharmacy benefit managers subject to the penalties provided in chapters 480 and 481, Hawaii Revised Statutes. Effective 7/1/2050. Repeals certain provisions on 6/30/2026. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Pharmacy Benefit Managers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 03-18-21 10:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 237) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 655) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-24-21 9:35AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 493) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-17-21 1:16PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-12-21 1:15PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB602 (Carry Over) 2021-03-18 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Independent or Rural Pharmacies
Insurance Commissioner
Licensure
Pharmacy Benefit Managers
Reporting
Rural Rate of Reimbursement
Insurance Commissioner
Licensure
Pharmacy Benefit Managers
Reporting
Rural Rate of Reimbursement