HI SB596 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB596
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-01 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for capital improvement projects of the department of public safety. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Public Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 5) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Fevella. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB596 (Carry Over) 2019-02-01 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.