HI SB596 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows condominium property regimes and cooperative housing corporations to prohibit smoking pursuant to an adoption of a rule.
Title
Smoking; Condominium Property Regimes; Cooperative Housing Corporations; Prohibition by Rule
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Fred Hemmings [R] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-11 | (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-11-09 2:40 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-09 2:45 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to HTH, CPN. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=596&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB596_.HTM |