HI SB594 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB594
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Referred to CPN.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the sunset date of Act 196, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018, that allowed for voluntary binding arbitration for condominium related disputes and amended the conditions for mediation.
Title
Relating To Condominiums.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB594 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to CPN.
HB381 (Same As) 2023-03-10 - Re-Referred to CPN, WAM.
HB381 (Same As) 2023-03-10 - Re-Referred to CPN, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=594&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB594_.HTM |