HI SB593 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB593
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows home schooled students to participate on an equal basis in extracurricular activities offered at the public school they would otherwise be required to attend.
Title
Relating To Extracurricular Activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB537 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB593 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
SB593 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=593&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB593_.HTM |