HI SB588 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB588
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of education to report the creation of any temporary positions to the legislature at least twenty days prior to the convening of each regular session.
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 243) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB588 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=588&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB588_.HTM |