HI SB585 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB585

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Hawaii climate change mitigation and adaptation commission to prioritize nature-based solutions in its climate change mitigation and adaptation efforts and assess risk transfer market mechanisms that promote investments in nature to reduce the risks of climate change. Defines "nature-based solutions". Appropriates moneys.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Climate Change.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to WTL/AEN, WAM.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB585 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback