HI SB584 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB584

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows community rehabilitation programs for persons with disabilities to be considered qualified under the State's procurement code without requiring federal and state certification that authorizes the payment of a subminimum wage to workers in their program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Qualified Community Rehabilitation Programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to LCA, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB787 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB584 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to LCA, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback