HI SB58 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB58
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies the existing plant and animal declaration form to also require in-bound travelers to the State to acknowledge state laws, federal laws, and individual responsibility to protect the environment and agriculture of the State. Requires all other documents travelers are required to complete to enter the State, except documents only relating to a dangerous communicable disease, to include an environmental and agricultural affirmation.
Title
Relating To Environmental And Agricultural Protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to AEN/EET, JDC. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB592 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB58 (Carry Over) 2023-01-20 - Referred to AEN/EET, JDC.
SB58 (Carry Over) 2023-01-20 - Referred to AEN/EET, JDC.
Subjects
Declaration Form
Department of Agriculture
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Environmental and Agricultural Affirmation
Tourism
Department of Agriculture
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Environmental and Agricultural Affirmation
Tourism
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=58&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB58_.HTM |