HI SB57 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-03 - (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-03 - (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers law enforcement jurisdiction over Iolani Palace from the department of land and natural resources to the department of public safety.
Title
Iolani Palace; Law Enforcement Jurisdiction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in PGM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 3:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Referred to WLH/PGM. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=57 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB57_.HTM |