HI SB566 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and appropriates funds for the department of public safety to create two pilot programs designed to promote inmate visitation at state correctional facilities. (SD1)
Title
Inmate Visitation; Appropriation; Department of Public Safety ($)
Sponsors
Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 46) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |