HI SB565 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires businesses located in tsunami evacuation areas to close at an unspecified period of time following first sounding of tidal wave or tsunami warning sirens until further notice. Makes qualifications for gas stations, businesses that sell staple goods, and health care providers.
Title
Disaster Relief; Tsunami Evacuation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 3:00PM in conference room 224. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM, CPN. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1044 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=565&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB565_.HTM |