HI SB556 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a refundable state earned income tax credit. Requires DOTAX to prepare an annual report on the tax credit's usage for the previous year. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2015.
Title
Taxation; Earned Income Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-13-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB56 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=556&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB556_.HTM |