HI SB548 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 28 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends various statutory provisions to clarify and improve the administration of elections by mail. Establishes voters with special needs advisory committees at the state and county levels. Requires the department of public safety and Hawaii paroling authority to inform individuals on parole or probation of their right to vote and provide them with voting information. Requires the office of elections and the county clerks to make a determination, as soon as practicable, of the optimal number and placement of voter service centers. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Elections By Mail.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-23 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2021-04-28SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634).
2021-04-28HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858).
2021-04-27HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-04-27SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
2021-04-23HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-27-21.
2021-04-23HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 143) as amended in (CD 1).
2021-04-23Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21.
2021-04-23SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 143).
2021-04-23HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Cullen, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-04-23SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-04-22SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-21 3:00PM; CR 325.
2021-04-21SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-21 3:00PM; CR 325.
2021-04-20SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-21 3:00PM; CR 325.
2021-04-19SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-21 3:10PM; CR 325.
2021-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
2021-04-16SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-21 2:15PM; CR 325.
2021-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Cullen Co-Chairs; Ward.
2021-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792).
2021-04-15HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790).
2021-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Lee, Fevella.
2021-04-15SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2021-04-15SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 522).
2021-04-13HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, LoPresti, Ohno excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-04-09HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21.
2021-04-09HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1867) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-04-01HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso.
2021-03-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-01-21 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-24HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1).
2021-03-24HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1340) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-03-16HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi.
2021-03-12HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-12HouseThe committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 03-16-21 at 2:00 PM in room 325.
2021-03-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Friday, 03-12-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-04HouseReferred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 19
2021-03-04HousePass First Reading
2021-02-24HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 57) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-02-24SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-02-22Senate48 Hrs. Notice 02-24-21.
2021-02-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2021-02-22SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 591) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2021-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 02-10-21 9:10AM in conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 9:30AM in conference room Videoconference.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to JDC .
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback