HI SB536 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 256, 07/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1358).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 256, 07/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1358).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that existing law intended to curb over-access to and abuse of opioids, including the time frame for filling prescriptions, supply limitations, and requirements to check the state electronic prescription accountability system and execute an informed consent process, do not apply to qualified patients who are prescribed or issued prescriptions pursuant to the State's Our Care, Our Choice Act. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Prescriptions.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 256, 07/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1358). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 256, on 07/05/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1358). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cachola, Har, Kong, Okimoto, Say voting no (5) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 27) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 27). |
2019-04-18 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, C. Lee, B. Kobayashi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, K. Rhoads, Ruderman, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-18-19 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-19 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, C. Lee, B. Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Ward. |
2019-04-12 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 899). |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 664). |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Kong voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cachola, Okimoto, Tokioka voting no (3) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-04 | House | Deferred one day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2072), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cachola voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1576), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McKelvey, Morikawa, Yamane. |
2019-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-18 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-19. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-18-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Har, Kong, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cachola voting no (1) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1310) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say, Tokioka; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 176) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 801) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 502) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/PSM, JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, CPH/JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB690 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).