HI SB536 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB536
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to the Department of Health for the full-time equivalent fall prevention and early detection coordinator position established by Act 153, Session Laws of Hawaii 2014. (SB536 HD1)
Title
Relating To Fall Prevention.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1264) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro, Tupola. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro, Tupola. |
2017-03-20 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Wednesday, 03-22-17 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 195) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 761) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported from CPH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 116) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB536 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
HB614 (Same As) 2017-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
HB614 (Same As) 2017-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).