HI SB535 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to EDU, JDC.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of education to develop a plan to transition the Hawaii School for the Deaf and Blind to a conversion charter school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Hawaii School For The Deaf And Blind.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27SenateReferred to EDU, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1078 (Same As) 2021-03-17 - Re-Referred to EDU, WAM/JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback