HI SB531 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB531
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes financial exploitation of a vulnerable adult by a caregiver a Class A felony. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 479) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Riviere. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/HMS, JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB531 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
HB691 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 5
HB691 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 5