HI SB522 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB522
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Department of Human Services (DHS) registered or licensed child care facilities to: (1) Place any child less than a year old on the child's back to sleep; (2) Discuss the Safe Sleep Policy with the child's parent or legal guardian before the child is enrolled in the facility; (3) Complete training in safe sleep practices; and (4) Report the death of a child, employee, or household member, and any illness or injury received at the facility to DHS within one working day of occurrence. (SB522 HD1)
Title
Relating To Human Services.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2018-03-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-04-25 | Senate | The conference committee deferred the measure. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 11:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Ihara, Galuteria Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Oshiro, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Har, Tupola. |
2017-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 675). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 521). |
2017-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Saiki excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1712), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-04-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1254) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro. |
2017-03-20 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Wednesday, 03-22-17 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 190) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 793) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Wakai. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Ihara, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Ruderman. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH/WAM. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 20) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH/WAM. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS, CPH/WAM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Wakai. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HMS, CPH. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB684 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to HHS, JUD, referral sheet 2
SB522 (Carry Over) 2017-04-25 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
SB522 (Carry Over) 2017-04-25 - The conference committee deferred the measure.