HI SB521 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB521
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes interfering with an essential worker during an emergency a felony. Defines essential worker.
Title
Relating To Emergency Management.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB643 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB521 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
SB521 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=521&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB521_.HTM |