HI SB521 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Act 207, 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1308).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Act 207, 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1308).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds up to $45,000,000 to Waimea Nui Community Development Corporation, a private not-for-profit corporation, for the planning, acquisition, and construction of agriculture, renewable energy, and educational facilities. (CD1)
Title
Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; Waimea Nui Community Development Corporation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | Act 207, 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1308). |
2015-07-06 | House | Act 207, on 07/02/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1308). |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 21) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 21). |
2015-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-29-15 3:45PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tsuji, Yamane, Cullen Co-Chairs; Evans, Pouha. |
2015-04-20 | House | Re-referred to AGR, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 54 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Ruderman Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 521). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1596) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-09 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2015-04-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-09-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ing, Luke excused (2). |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1092), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-23 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Ing, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen. |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-23-15 10:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-20 | House | Re-referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to AGR, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 152) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 736) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 21) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Taniguchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Wakai, Slom. |
2015-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-15 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to AGL, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB608 (Same As) 2015-03-10 - Referred to AGL, WAM.