HI SB512 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Act 006, 04/12/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1107).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Act 006, 04/12/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1107).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for operating expenses for the department of transportation. (SB512 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Act 006, 04/12/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1107). |
2019-04-15 | House | Act 006, on 04/12/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1107). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 894). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-19. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-11-19. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 716). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2215) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto. |
2019-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:30PM in conference room 308. |
2019-03-29 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-19. |
2019-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1628), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-20-19 10:45AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 165) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1142) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Taniguchi. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 163) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, English, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Shimabukuro. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |