HI SB508 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB508
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Education to establish and administer an ocean safety and stewardship education program for all fourth grade public school students. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 995) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN. |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 03-16-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to WAL, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 224). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 854) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 72) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EDU/WTL, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB508 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).