HI SB508 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB508
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires real property transfer fees assessed by a condominium association, a cooperative housing corporation, a limited-equity housing cooperative, or a planned community association to include an itemized accounting of services rendered and covered by the transfer fees.
Title
Relating To Transfer Fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB508 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=508&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB508_.HTM |