HI SB508 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Supports the applied archaeology graduate program at the University of Hawaii at Manoa; makes appropriation. (SD1)
Title
University of Hawaii; Archaeology Graduate Program; Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Gary Hooser [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from HRE/EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 285) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Ige, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. | |
2009-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Sakamoto, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kokubun, Takamine, Taniguchi. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on HRE/EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-09 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-02-02 | (S) Re-Referred to HRE/EDT, WAM. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to HRE, WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |