HI SB503 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of land and natural resources to implement a public restroom maintenance system that includes restrooms located in areas under the jurisdiction of the department. Requires the department to establish an asset management system for public restrooms within the public restroom maintenance system. Makes an appropriation to the DLNR to establish and maintain the public restroom maintenance system.
Title
Department of Land and Natural Resources; Public Restroom Maintenance System; Public Restroom Asset Management System; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-15 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=503&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB503_.HTM |