HI SB488 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB488
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of agriculture to conduct a study on what metrics to use to accurately determine how much food is locally produced. Directs the department of agriculture to consult with a firm that specializes in food security metrics and with the department of business, economic development, and tourism to recommend a food security metric system for Hawaii. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Local Food Production.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from AEN/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 426) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/EET, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB488 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.