HI SB483 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HWN/WLA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Re-Referred to HWN/WLA, WAM.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that DHHL may utilize Hawaiian home lands for the forestry of koa or native trees. Allows DHHL to enter into public-private partnerships to implement the forestry plan. Requires the proceeds from the forestry plan to be deposited into the Hawaiian home lands trust fund. (SD1)
Title
DHHL; Koa and Native Tree Forestation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN/WLA, WAM. |
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HWN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 229) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Ihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Inouye, Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 02-11-15 1:25PM in conference room 224. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-11-15 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-15 2:50PM in conference room 224. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HWN/WTL, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |