HI SB483 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires state agencies to comply with county rules to grant or deny permit applications for development-related permits within a specified time as contained in county rule; provided that if a county agency has not adopted such a rule and a state law specifies a maximum time period for granting or denying a state permit, the time period under state law shall prevail. (SD1)
Title
Administrative Procedures; Time Period to Review Applications for County Permits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from EGH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 371) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-05-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, English, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-13 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EGH/PSM, JDL. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |